Imperial oil board of directors
Witryna24 lut 2024 · Following the recommendation of the company's nominations and corporate governance committee, on February 24, 2024, the board of directors nominated … WitrynaOur board of directors is pleased to announce the appointment of B.W. (Brad) Corson as president, effective September 17, 2024. Chairman and chief...
Imperial oil board of directors
Did you know?
WitrynaMAIN CONTACT FOR BOARD OF DIRECTORS. Yvonne Lee. Executive Assistant. [email protected]. 647-556-5815. WitrynaImperial Oil Limited Board Compensation Info 2024 Average Compensation per Director: $178,771 Director Share Ownership Requirement*: 2.4x 2024 Total Board …
Witryna24 lut 2024 · Following the recommendation of the company's nominations and corporate governance committee, on February 24, 2024, the board of directors nominated M.R. (Matthew) Crocker as a nominee for director on the slate of nominees. Mr. Witryna29 kwi 2024 · CALGARY, Alberta-- (BUSINESS WIRE)-- Imperial Oil Limited (TSE: IMO, NYSE American: IMO) announced today that the Board of Directors, on the recommendation of a special committee of independent directors, has authorized the initiation of a substantial issuer bid (the “Offer”) pursuant to which the company will …
Witryna• Petrophysics Advisor and Technical Director of Petrophysics (Wireline) at Schlumberger since 2007. Graduate reservoir engineer and practicing petrophysicist since 1989. - Deep expertise and worldwide experience in data acquisition and formation evaluation of oil & gas reservoirs – all environments, properties and fluid … WitrynaMr. Richard Francis Haskayne, O.C., A.O.E., FCA, Board Chair Emeritus, University of Calgary, is the past Chair of the Board of TransCanada Corporation, retiring in April 2005. He was Chair of Fording Inc. from 2001 to 2003, retiring when the company was converted into a trust. He was Chair of NOVA Corporation from 1992 to 1998 when …
WitrynaBrian Ahearn retired as Vice-President, Western Canada of the Canadian Fuels Association, the organization that represents the industry that supplies 95 percent of Canada’s transportation fuels. Brian joined Imperial Oil (Canadian affiliate of ExxonMobil) in 1978 and his career with the company spanned 34 years. As a …
Witryna26 lip 2024 · Miranda C. Hubbs Business Wire. CALGARY, Alberta — Imperial Oil Limited is pleased to announce the appointment of Miranda C. Hubbs to its Board of Directors, effective July 26, 2024. Ms. Hubbs is currently an independent director of Nutrien Ltd. and the Public Sector Pension Investment Board, one of Canada’s … pop up allow in internet explorerWitryna22 lut 2024 · directors at Imperial's May 2, 2024 annual meeting as they have reached the company's mandatory retirement age. Following the recommendation of the company's nominations and corporate governance committee, the board of directors nominated S.R. (Sharon) Driscoll, J. (John) Floren and G.J. (Gary) Goldberg as … sharon huggard the style coachWitryna17 mar 2024 · Board member with Imperial Oil (Canadian petroleum refiner, crude oil and natural gas producer). Lorraine Mitchelmore: Board member with Alberta Investment Management Corporation (AIMCo).... popupandchillWitrynaHaving founded in 2024 and maintained so far an impressive client database all around the world, Imperial Trust Invest Israel offers a wide range of professional services to a client that includes corporate organizations, financial institutions and government entities. The company is located in Israel being a part of Imperial Banking … pop up and beyondWitrynaBoard of Directors Molecular Energies is at the forefront of energy development focused on high margin production opportunities across the energy spectrum, globally. About Us History Objective and Strategy Board of Directors Management Corporate Governance popup anchorWitrynaBoard of directors Leadership team Governance History Partnerships Indigenous relations Suppliers Brands Atkins Faithful+Gould Security Projects Beyond engineering Priorities Digital Engineering Net Zero Sustainability Targets & governance Strategy & approach Sustainability report Our ESG measurement categories Energy Materials … sharon hughes st philipsIn April 1880, Jacob Lewis Englehart and sixteen prominent oil refiners in London and Petrolia formed Imperial Oil in response to Standard Oil's growing dominance of the oil market. Englehart was the driving force behind the partnership, hoping to emulate John D. Rockefeller and merge the entire Canadian oil industry into one conglomerate. Although the majority of Ontario's top oil producers agree… pop up a manual of paper mechanisms pdf